Dogfen lywodraethu VICTORIA HALL
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
SCHEME DATED 25/04/1996 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 26/04/2000 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 26/04/2010 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 18/04/2011 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 16/04/2012
Gwrthrychau elusennol
USE BY THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF HARTLEY WINTNEY AS A READING OR GENERAL RECREATION ROOM, OR FOR HOLDING ENTERTAINMENTS OR GIVING LECTURES THEREIN, R FOR PUBLIC OR PRIVATE MEETINGS, OR FOR SUCH OTHER PURPOSES FOR THE ACCOMMODATION OR BENEFIT OF THE SAID INHABITANTS AS THE COUNCIL SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE OR DIRECT.
Maes buddion
PARISH OF HARTLEY WINTNEY
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.