Dogfen lywodraethu THE DOUGLAS HAIG MEMORIAL HOMES
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
DEED OF TRUST 17 JAN 1929, SCHEMES OF 7 JAN 1997, 22 JAN 1997 AND S74(2)(A) RESOLUTION DATED 9 NOV 1999, SCHEMES OF 24 MAY 2001, 25 MARCH 2003, 7 APRIL 2003, 6 OCT 2004 & 2 JUNE 2005. SCHEME AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 17/09/2013
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROVIDE HOUSING ASSISTANCE FOR THE FOLLOWING PERSONS : (A) MEMBERS AND FORMER MEMBERS OF THE NAVAL MILITARY AND AIR FORCES AND RESERVE FORCES OF THE CROWN, MERCHANT NAVY AND FISHING FLEETS PROVIDED THEY ARE SERVING OR HAVE/SHALL HAVE SERVED AFLOAT DURING HOSTILITIES OUTSIDE EXAMINATION AREAS. (B) WIDOWS AND WIDOWERS CHILDREN OR OTHER DEPENDANTS OF DECEASED MEMBERS OF THE NAVAL MILITARY AND AIR FORCES AND RESERVE FORCES OF THE CROWN AND OF THE MERCHANT NAVY AND FISHING FLEETS PROVIDED THAT SUCH LAST-MENTIONED MEMBERS HAVE/SHALL HAVE SERVED AS AFORESAID. (C) WIVES HUSBANDS CHILDREN OR OTHER DEPENDENTS OF LIVING MEMBERS OF THE NAVAL MILITARY AND AIR FORCES AND RESERVE FORCES OF THE CROWN AND MEMBERS OF THE MERCHANT NAVY AND FISHING FLEETS PROVIDED THAT SUCH LAST-MENTIONED MEMBERS ARE SERVING OR HAVE SERVED AS AFORESAID.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.