Dogfen lywodraethu ST LUKE'S PAROCHIAL TRUST
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
SCHEME DATED 17/06/1983 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 30/12/1983 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 29/11/1994 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 29/04/1998 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 17/06/2010 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 24/09/2014
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1. PAYMENT OF PENSIONS TO POOR PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT FOR NOT LESS THAN 5 YEARS NEXT PRECEDING THE TIME OF APPOINTMENT OR A CONSECUTIVE PERIOD OF NOT LESS THAN 15 YEARS AT ANY TIME. 2. (A) FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS.
Maes buddion
FORMER PARISH OF ST LUKE OLD STREET
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.