Dogfen lywodraethu THE BENEVOLENT FUND OF THE INSTITUTION OF CIVIL ENGINEERS
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
RULES CONFIRMED AT A SPECIAL GENERAL MEETING HELD ON 26TH OCTOBER 1964, AS AMENDED ON 24TH APRIL 1967, 19TH MAY 1969, 24TH MAY 1971, 7TH JUNE 1972, 3RD JUNE 1987, 20TH JULY 1990, 11TH MARCH 1997 AND 6 SEPTEMBER 2006.
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO AFFORD ASSISTANCE TO PERSONS IN NEED WHO ARE (A) CORPORATE AND NON-CORPORATE MEMBERS OF THE INSTITUTION OF CIVIL ENGINEERS, OR (B) FORMER CORPORATE AND NON-CORPORATE MEMBERS WHO HAVE PAID THEIR SUBSCRIPTIONS TO THE INSTITUTION FOR AT LEAST FIVE YEARS, OR (C) DEPENDANTS OF ANY OF THE ABOVE MENTIONED (A) OR (B) WHETHER THE MEMBER IS ALIVE OR DECEASED, OR (D) THE DEPENDANTS OF ANY FORMER MEMBER OF THE INSTITUTION OF MUNICIPAL ENGINEERS (WHETHER SUCH FORMER MEMBER IS ALIVE OR DECEASED) WHO WOULD NOT BE ELIGIBLE FOR ASSISTANCE UNDER PARAGRAPHS (A)-(C) INCLUSIVE OF THIS RULE.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.