Dogfen lywodraethu VARIETY THE CHILDREN'S CHARITY
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 16/07/1952 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14/10/1981 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11/03/1987 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 22/11/1995 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14/11/1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 18/03/2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21/04/2009 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 28/05/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13 DEC 2017 as amended on 27 Feb 2023
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1. TO PROMOTE AND PROVIDE FOR THE CARE AND UPBRINGING OF SICK, DISABLED AND DISADVANTAGED CHILDREN WITHIN THE UNITED KINGDOM; 2. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL NEED OF CHILDREN WITHIN THE UNITED KINGDOM; 3. TO UNDERTAKE AND TO ASSIST OTHERS TO UNDERTAKE RESEARCH INTO ANY ILLNESS OR AFFLICTION AFFECTING CHILDREN WHICH WILL ADVANCE KNOWLEDGE AND TO PUBLISH THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH; 4. THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR CHILDREN IN THE INTERESTS OF THEIR SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR SUCH CHILDREN
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.