Dogfen lywodraethu THE FRANCIS BACON SOCIETY INCORPORATED
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM DATED 20 AUGUST 1903 AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION DATED 22 JUNE 1950 AND SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS OF 11 MARCH 1952, 11 MARCH 1953, 9 JANUARY 1963 AND 28 MAY 1965 AND 14TH JULY 1999.
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO ENCOURAGE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE STUDY OF THE WORKS OF FRANCIS BACON AS PHILOSOPHER, LAWYER, STATESMEN AND POET; ALSO HIS CHARACTER, GENIUS AND LIFE; HIS INFLUENCE ON HIS OWN AND SUCCEEDING TIMES, AND THE TENDENCIES AND RESULTS OF HIS WRITINGS. (2) TO ENCOURAGE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE GENERAL STUDY OF THE EVIDENCE IN FAVOUR OF FRANCIS BACON'S AUTHORSHIP OF THE PLAYS COMMONLY ASCRIBED TO SHAKESPEARE AND TO INVESTIGATE HIS CONNECTION WITH OTHER WORKS OF THE ELIZABETHAN PERIOD
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.