Dogfen lywodraethu THE SHEN PLACE ALMSHOUSES
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 29 JUNE 1911, AS AMENDED BY SCHEME OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS DATED 16 JULY 1981, AND ORDER DATED 15 JULY 2003 AND SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 24 MAY 2010. SCHEME AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 26/06/2014 AND TRUST DEED OF AMENDMENT 29/07/2014
Gwrthrychau elusennol
OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY (1) THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE: (A) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY BY THE PROVISION OF ALMSHOUSE ACCOMMODATION FOR BENEFICIARIES; AND (B) SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE RESIDENTS AS THE TRUSTEES DECIDE. (2) SUBJECT TO THE PROVISIONS OF CLAUSE 4 (POWER TO DISPOSE OF AND REPLACE PURPOSE PROPERTY), THE LAND IDENTIFIED IN THE SCHEDULE TO THIS SCHEME MUST BE RETAINED BY THE TRUSTEES FOR USE FOR THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY.
Maes buddion
BRENTWOOD IN ESSEX.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.