Dogfen lywodraethu MARY ANN ELLEN FROW FOR ALMSHOUSES IN CONNECTION WITH THE JOHN ROBINSON MEMORIAL CHURCH
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
WILL PROVED IN THE P.R. ON THE 8TH SEPTEMBER 1922. SCHEMES OF 3RD FEBRUARY 1925, 15TH JANUARY 1969 AND 3 NOVEMBER 1982. AS AMENDED BY A SCHEME OF THE COMMISSIONERS DATED 19TH SEPTEMBER 2005 as amended on 13 Jun 2018
Gwrthrychau elusennol
ALMSHOUSES FOR THE POOR BELONGING TO THE JOHN ROBINSON MEMORIAL CHURCH AT GAINSBOROUGH AND IN DEFAULT THEREOF BELONGING TO OR CONNECTED WITH ANY OTHER UNITED REFORMED CHURCH IN THE COUNTY OF LINCOLNSHIRE (AS CONSTITUTED ON THE 31 MARCH 1974) AND IN DEFAULT THEROF BELONGING TO OR CONNECTED WITH ANY OTHER CHURCH IN GAINSBOROUGH BELONGING TO A DENOMINATION AFFILIATED TO THE BRITISH COUNCIL OF CHURCHES OR CONNECTED WITH ANY SUCH CHURCH ELSEWHERE IN THE COUNTRY OF LINCOLN.
Maes buddion
GAINSBOROUGH
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.