Dogfen lywodraethu Dickinson Massey Underwood Gill Trust
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
SCHEME 11TH MAY 2007 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 20 OCT 2017 as amended on 20 Oct 2017 as amended on 04 Feb 2021 as amended on 29 Nov 2023 as amended on 29 Nov 2023 as amended on 29 Nov 2023
Gwrthrychau elusennol
4 (1) THE RELIEF OF PERSONS RESIDENT, OR WHO HAVE AT SOME TIME RESIDED, IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHO ARE IN NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS. (2) THE TRUSTEES MUST GIVE PREFERENCE TO PERSONS WHO ARE CHRISTIANS
Maes buddion
THE CITY OF NOTTINGHAM AND THE COUNTY OF NOTTINGHAMSHIRE, THE CITY OF DERBY, THE COUNTY OF DERBYSHIRE, THE CITY OF LINCOLN AND THE COUNTY OF LINCOLNSHIRE
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.