Dogfen lywodraethu ST JOHN'S HOSPITAL
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
SCHEME DATED 08/01/1976 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 25/05/1983 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 16/09/1997 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 03/05/2007 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 03/11/2011 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 26/09/2014
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1 THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF ALMSHOUSES FOR POOR PERSONS OF GOOD CHARACTER, WHO ARE RESIDENT IN THE DIOCESE OF LICHFIELD AT THE TIME OF APPOINTMENT. 2 PAYMENTS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE ALMSPEOPLE OF THE CHARITY. 3 FOR PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE DIOCESE OF LICHFIELD WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS BY MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY OR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE TRUSTS).
Maes buddion
DIOCESE OF LICHFIELD
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.