Dogfen lywodraethu THE BRITISH DIABETIC ASSOCIATION
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 21/06/1962 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 08/06/1993 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05/07/1994 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 30/07/1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 29/07/1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20/07/2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 04/09/2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 29/09/2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 29/09/2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27/09/2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 26/09/2009 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 02/07/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12 MAY 2017 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 28 MAR 2018
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE OBJECTS ARE: 1. TO PROVIDE RELIEF FOR PEOPLE WITH DIABETES AND ITS RELATED COMPLICATIONS AND THOSE WHO CARE FOR THEM; 2. TO PROMOTE THE WELFARE OF PEOPLE WITH DIABETES AND ITS RELATED COMPLICATIONS AND OF THOSE WHO CARE FOR THEM; 3. TO ADVANCE THE UNDERSTANDING OF DIABETES BY EDUCATION OF PEOPLE WITH DIABETES, THE HEALTH PROFESSIONALS AND OTHERS WHO CARE FOR THEM, AND THE GENERAL PUBLIC; AND 4. TO IMPROVE AND FUND RESEARCH RELATED TO THE CAUSES , PREVENTION AND CURE OF DIABETES AND INTO IMPROVEMENTS IN THE MANAGEMENT OF THE CONDITION AND ITS COMPLICATIONS, AND TO PUBLISH THE RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH.
Maes buddion
NATIONAL
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.