Dogfen lywodraethu DAME ALICE LEIGH'S ALMSHOUSE
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
SCHEME OF 22 DECEMBER 1954, ACT TO CONFIRM SCHEME OF 28 MARCH 1956 AS AMENDED BY SCHEMES OF 11 JANUARY 1972 AND 2 SEPTEMBER 1977. AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 08 AUG 2017 as amended on 16 Jul 2019 as amended on 04 Jun 2024
Gwrthrychau elusennol
PROVISION AND REPAIR OF ALMSHOUSES FOR POOR PERSONS OF GOOD CHARACTER. TO BE PAID ANNUALLY TO THE VICAR OF STONELEIGH FOR PREACHING A SERMON TO THE ALMSPEOPLE ONCE A YEAR IN THE PARISH CHURCH. BALANCE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE ALMSPEOPLE AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL THINK FIT ANY OTHER SURPLUS INCOME FOR THE RELIEF IN NEED OF PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF THE ANCIENT PARISH OF STONELEIGH.
Maes buddion
ANCIENT PARISH OF STONELEIGH.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.