Dogfen lywodraethu NORTHUMBERLAND WILDLIFE TRUST LIMITED
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 13 MARCH 1962 (MODEL) AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 10 DECEMBER 1970, 31 MARCH 1971, 18 MAY 2002 AND 19TH MAY 2007. AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 16 SEP 2017
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(1) FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, TO ADVANCE, PROMOTE AND FURTHER (PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY WITHIN THE COUNTY OF NORTHUMBERLAND, CITY OF NEWCASTLE AND BOROUGH OF NORTH TYNESIDE OR OTHER SUCH DESIGNATION AS MAY BE GIVEN TO THOSE AREAS) THE CONSERVATION MAINTENANCE AND PROTECTION OF (A) WILDLIFE AND ITS HABITATS (B) PLACES OF NATURAL BEAUTY (C) PLACES & OBJECTS OF ZOOLOGICAL, BOTANICAL, ECOLOGICAL, GEOGRAPHICAL, ARCHAEOLOGICAL, HISTORICAL OR SCIENTIFIC INTEREST (D) FEATURES OF LANDSCAPE WITH GEOLOGICAL, PHYSIOGRAPHICAL OR AMENITY VALUE, IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, IN WAYS THAT FURTHER BIODIVERSITY. (2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN (A) THE PRINCIPLES AND PRACTICE OF SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT (B) THE PRINCIPLES AND PRACTICE OF BIODIVERSITY CONSERVATION. (3) TO PROMOTE RESEARCH IN ALL BRANCHES OF NATURE STUDY AND TO PUBLISH THE USEFUL RESULTS THEREOF.
Maes buddion
NORTHUMBERLAND, NORTH TYNESIDE AND CITY OF NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.