Dogfen lywodraethu Galloway Hall
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
CONSTITUTION AS AMENDED 4 JULY 1956, 11 AUGUST 1975, 28 JANUARY 2002 AND 18 MARCH 2010. AS AMENDED ON 25 JUL 2016 as amended on 27 Jan 2022
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(A) TO PROMOTE ALL AND ANY PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF SENIOR CITIZENS IN THE FULWOOD AREA OF PRESTON, ALTHOUGH NOT EXCLUSIVELY, WHICH NOW ARE OR HEREAFTER MAY BE DEEMED BY LAW TO BE CHARITABLE., IN PARTICULAR BY ASSISTING THE WORK OF STATUTORY AUTHORITIES AND VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS ENGAGED IN ADVANCING EDUCATION,FURTHERING HEALTH, RELIEVING POVERTY, DISTRESS OF SICKNESS OR IN PURSUING ANY OBJECTS WHICH NOW OR HEREAFTER MAY BE DEEMED BY LAW TO BE CHARITABLE. (B) TO PROMOTE AND ORGANISE CO-OPERATION IN THE ACHIEVEMENT OF THE ABOVE PURPOSES OR ANY OF THEM AND TO THAT END TO BRING TOGETHER IN COUNCIL, REPRESENTATIVES OF THE AUTHORITIES AND ORGANISATIONS ENGAGED IN THE FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE PURPOSES OR ANY OF THEM FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE ABOVE.
Maes buddion
FULWOOD
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.