Dogfen lywodraethu THE INSTITUTE OF RACE RELATIONS
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 1ST APRIL 1958 AS AMENDED 24TH JANUARY 1962, 22ND JULY 1964, 16TH JULY 1969 AND 10 APRIL 2006 as amended on 12 Dec 2019
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(A) TO PROMOTE, ENCOURAGE AND SUPPORT THE STUDY AND UNDERSTANDING OF, AND THE EXCHANGE OF INFORMATION ABOUT, RELATIONS BETWEEN DIFFERENT RACES AND PEOPLES AND THE CIRCUMSTANCES AND CONDITIONS IN WHICH THEY LIVE AND WORK. (B) TO CONSIDER AND ADVISE UPON ANY PROPOSALS OR ENDEAVOURS TO IMPROVE SUCH RELATIONS, CIRCUMSTANCES AND CONDITIONS. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 3 (I).
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.