Dogfen lywodraethu Prosper Wakefield District Ltd
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 06/12/1950 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 18/11/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 02/05/2012 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 03/05/2012 as amended on 11 Nov 2021 as amended on 11 Nov 2021 as amended on 11 Nov 2021 as amended on 24 Jul 2023
Gwrthrychau elusennol
The Objects of the Charity are for the public benefit such exclusively charitable purposes (according to the law of England and Wales) as the trustees of the Charity in their absolute discretion think fit from time to time.
Maes buddion
BOROUGHS OF WAKEFIELD AND DEWSBURY AND ADJACENT DISTRICT
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.