Dogfen lywodraethu JOHN EATON'S ALMSHOUSES
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
SCHEME OF THE 13 APRIL 1978 AS VARIED BY SCHEME OF 14 DECEMBER 1994 AND RESOLUTION OF 9 NOVEMBER 2009 AND SCHEME OF 24 FEBRUARY 2010
Gwrthrychau elusennol
ALMSHOUSES FOR POOR PERSONS OF NOT LESS THAN 60 YEARS OF AGE WHO (EXCEPT IN SPECIAL CASES TO BE APPROVED BY THE COMMISSIONERS) HAVE RESIDED IN THE AREA OF THE CITY OF SHEFFIELD AS CONSTITUTED ON THE 31 JANUARY 1939 FOR NOT LESS THAN THREE YEARS NEXT PRECEDING THE TIME OF THEIR APPOINTMENT.IF SUITABLE PERSONS CANNOT BE FOUND WITHIN THE AREA DEFINED ABOVE THEN THE TRUSTEES MAY CONSIDER SUCH OTHER SUITABLY QUALIFIED PERSONS RESIDING WITHIN THE AREA OF THE CITY OF SHEFFIELD AS CONSTITUTED FROM TIME TO TIME.
Maes buddion
SHEFFIELD
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.