Dogfen lywodraethu THE PIRBRIGHT INSTITUTE
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 07/01/1956 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 04/07/1978 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20/10/1987 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15/07/1988 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 24/03/1995 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 21/03/1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27/03/2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15/09/2009 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 04/10/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 19/03/2013 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 21/11/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 22/12/2014
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO CONDUCT AND PROMOTE SCIENTIFIC RESEARCH ON DISEASES OF ANIMALS, INCLUDING EXOTIC DISEASES AND TO DEVELOP APPROPRIATE METHODS FOR THEIR CONTROL, AND ON ALL MATTERS CONCERNED WITH ANIMAL HEALTH AND ANCILLARY THERETO AND TO PUBLISH THE RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH; AND TO PREPARE, EDIT, PRINT, PUBLISH, ISSUE, ACQUIRE AND CIRCULATE ANY LITERARY WORKS OR MATTERS TREATING OF OR BEARING ON THE SAID RESEARCH WORK, ESTABLISH AND MAINTAIN COLLECTIONS OF MATERIAL, LITERATURE AND SCIENTIFIC DATA RELATING THERETO, DISSEMINATE INFORMATION OBTAINED THEREFROM, AND CONTRIBUTE TOWARDS THE PROVISION OF A LIBRARY OR LIBRARIES DESIGNED TO ASSIST SUCH WORK.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.