Dogfen lywodraethu THE FRANCIS W RECKITT ARTS TRUST
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 30/09/1929 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 01/08/1958 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 08/06/2011 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 21/12/2011 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 10/03/2016
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY IS, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, POVERTY AND SICKNESS AMONG ARTISTS BY: (1) THE PROVISION OF GRANTS TO ENABLE ARTISTS WHO ARE IN NEED OF SUCH ASSISTANCE TO ACCESS FACILITIES AND/OR SUITABLE ACCOMMODATION TO ENABLE THEM TO PRACTICE THEIR PROFESSION SO AS TO BRING THEMSELVES OUT OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND/OR POVERTY; (2) THE PROVISION OF GRANTS TO ENABLE TEMPORARY ACCOMMODATION TO BE SECURED FOR ARTISTS IN NEED OF SUCH ASSISTANCE WHO ARE RECOVERING FROM ILLNESS.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.