Dogfen lywodraethu BURNLEY ACORN FUND
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
SCHEME 30/11/1951 AND RESOLUTION MADE UNDER SECTION 74 OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1993 AS AMENDED BY S 74D RESOLUTIONS DATED 1 JULY 2008 AND 24 MARCH 2009 AS ALTERED BY SCHEME DATED 12/2/2010 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 04 APR 2017
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1. MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY FOR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS OR SERVICES OR FACILITIES FOR THE RELIEF OF THE SICK-POOR LIVING IN THE BOROUGH OF BURNLEY EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF GRANTS GOODS OR SERVICES. 2. TO RELIEVE ELDERLY PEOPLE RESIDING IN THEIR OWN HOMES WITHIN THE BOROUGH OF BURNLEY WHO ARE IN NEED, BY PROVIDING SPECIALLY DESIGNED OR ADAPTED HOUSING AND ITEMS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES CALCULATED TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF SUCH PERSONS
Maes buddion
BURNLEY AND DISTRICT
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.