Dogfen lywodraethu THE DOHNAVUR FELLOWSHIP CORPORATION
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 30TH JANUARY 1947 AMENDED 24TH MARCH 1950 AND 3RD MARCH 1952 21ST NOVEMBER 1990 AND 16 NOVEMBER 1993. AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 18/10/2014
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO SAVE CHILDREN FROM MORAL DANGER, TO TRAIN THEM TO SERVE OTHERS; TO RELIEVE EVERY KIND OF SUFFERING; TO MAKE KNOWN THE LOVE OF GOD BY ALL MEANS ESPECIALLY TO THE PEOPLE OF INDIA; AND TO PROVIDE FOR RETIRED MISSIONARIES OF THE DOHNAVUR FELLOWSHIP WHO HAVE GIVEN THEIR LIVES TO SUCH WORK. FOR DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 3 OF MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.