Dogfen lywodraethu WILLIAM BERMAN'S TRUST
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
SCHEME DATED 30 OCT 1953 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 11 MAY 1989 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 02 APR 1997 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 16 JUL 2003 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 01 SEP 2016 as amended on 10 Apr 2019 as amended on 06 Nov 2019
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1. ALMSHOUSES FOR TWELVE POOR WOMEN OF GOOD CONDUCT EITHER WIDOWS OR UNMARRIED WHO SHALL BE OF THE AGE OF 50 YEARS AT LEAST. 2. TO DISLODGED ALMSWOMEN IN BASING SQUARE WHO DECLINE APPOINTMENT IN PRESENT ALMSHOUSES. A SUM NOT EXCEEDING 12 SHILLINGS PER WEEK. 3. STIPEND TO ALMSWOMEN NOT EXCEEDING 12 SHILLINGS WEEKLY. 4. ANY RESIDUE TO (A) ASSISTANCE TO MINISTERS OF RELIGION (B) ASSISTANCE OF CANDIDATES TRAINING FR THE MINISTRY (C) SUPPORT OF ORPHANAGES OR SIMILAR INSTITUTIONS (D) THE RELIEF OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM INCURABLE OR CHRONIC DECEASE (E) RELIEF NOT EXCEEDING ·100 IN ANY ONE YEAR OF PERSONS IN URGENT NEED WHOM THE TRUSTEES CONSIDER DESERVING OF EXCEPTIONAL AID
Maes buddion
NATIONAL
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.