Dogfen lywodraethu THE FEOFFEE CHARITY
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
SCHEME OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS DATED 18 NOVEMBER 1955, AS AMENDED BY SCHEMES DATED 14 APRIL 1966, AND 9 SEPTEMBER 1985, ORDER DATED 26 APRIL 2005 AND MEMORANDUM DATED 12 APRIL 2005. as amended on 19 Nov 2019 as amended on 31 May 2024
Gwrthrychau elusennol
A) THE TRUSTEES SHALL PAY TO THE TRUSTEES OF THE CHARITY CALLED THE EDUCATIONAL CHARITY CONSTITUTED BY THE SCHEME DATED 26 JANUARY 1897 A SUM OF ú165. B) THE TRUSTEES SHALL PAY THE RESIDUE OF THE YEARLY INCOME FOR RELIEF IN NEED IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE SCHEME DATED 9 SEPTEMBER 1985. C) IF AND IN SO FAR AS INCOME IN ANY YEAR IS NOT REQUIRED FOR APPLICATION IN MANNER AFORESAID THE TRUSTEES MAY APPLY THE SAME AS THEY THINK FIT FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Maes buddion
ANCIENT PARISH OF DOWNHAM.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.