Dogfen lywodraethu CAMPAIGN FOR THE PROTECTION OF RURAL WALES (CPRW), YMGYRCH DIOGELU CYMRU WLEDIG (YDCW)
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 09/05/1964 AS AMENDED ON 12/07/1977 AS AMENDED ON 25/06/1983 AS AMENDED ON 29/06/1991 AS AMENDED ON 22/06/1996 AS AMENDED ON 26/06/1999 AS AMENDED ON 25/06/2005 AS AMENDED ON 03/07/2010 AS AMENDED ON 02/07/2011
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(A) TO ORGANISE CONCERTED ACTION TO SECURE THE PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE LANDSCAPE AND ENVIRONMENT OF THE COUNTRYSIDE OF WALES, RECOGNISING THE IMPORTANCE OF ITS COMMUNITIES AND INDIGENOUS CULTURES (B) TO ACT AS A CENTRE FOR FURNISHING OR PROCURING ADVICE AND INFORMATION UPON ANY MATTERS AFFECTING SUCH PROTECTION AND ENHANCEMENT (C) TO AROUSE, FORM AND EDUCATE OPINION IN ORDER TO ENSURE THE PROMOTION OF THE AFORESAID OBJECTS.
Maes buddion
WALES
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.