Dogfen lywodraethu NATIONAL SHEEP ASSOCIATION
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 21/12/1892 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 08/08/1902 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27/10/1954 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05/05/1959 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 16/05/1967 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11/11/1969 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 25/05/1977 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 26/05/1988 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 06/09/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12/08/2015
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO ENCOURAGE AND IMPROVE BREEDING, MANAGEMENT AND PROMOTION OF THE SHEEP AS A SPECIES AND AS AN INDUSTRY IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ELSEWHERE. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE MEMORANDUM OF ASSOCIATION).
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.