Dogfen lywodraethu STRATFORD-UPON-AVON SOCIETY
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19/01/1966 AS AMENDED ON 12/03/2001 AS AMENDED ON 07/03/2005 AS AMENDED ON 05/03/2007 AS AMENDED ON 07/03/2011 AS AMENDED ON 18/05/2015
Gwrthrychau elusennol
A) TO PROMOTE HIGH STANDARDS OF PLANNING AND ARCHITECTURE IN OR AFFECTING THE AREA OF THE TOWN AND ITS SURROUNDINGS; B) TO STIMULATE AN INTEREST AND EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE GEOGRAPHY, HISTORY, NATURAL HISTORY AND ARCHITECTURE OF THE SAID AREA; C) TO SECURE THE PRESERVATION, PROTECTION, DEVELOPMENT AND IMPROVEMENT OF FEATURES OF HISTORIC OR PUBLIC INTEREST IN THE SAID AREA.
Maes buddion
STRATFORD-UPON-AVON AND SURROUNDINGS.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.