Dogfen lywodraethu THE DOWNSIDE SETTLEMENT
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 17/04/1936 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20/11/1968 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05/05/1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 23/05/2001 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 07/12/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 08/01/2014
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1. TO PROVIDE AND RUN FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATIONS FOR YOUNG PERSONS, IN THE INTERESTS OF THEIR SOCIAL WELFARE WITHIN THE MEANING OF THE RECREATIONAL CHARITIES ACT 1958 AS THEREIN LIMITED WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITION IN LIFE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE CHRISTIAN ETHOS; AND 2.TO UNDERTAKE RESEARCH INTO THE SPECIAL PROBLEMS ARISING FROM THE LACK OF RECREATIONAL AND EDUCATIONAL FACILITIES FOR YOUNG PERSONS IN BERMONDSEY AND INTO METHODS OF IMPROVING SUCH FACILITIES AND TO PUBLISH AND/OR IMPLEMENT THE RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH.
Maes buddion
BERMONDSEY OR ELSEWHERE IN LONDON.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.