Trosolwg o’r elusen YORK SAMARITANS
Rhif yr elusen: 1168071-1
Elusen gysylltiedig
Dogfen lywodraethu
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 05/05/1967
AS AMENDED ON 21/11/1979
AS AMENDED ON 06/10/1993
AS AMENDED ON 24/06/2004
AS AMENDED ON 09/06/2008
AS AMENDED ON 16/06/2010
AS AMENDED ON 08/12/2012
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO WORK FOR THE ASSISTANCE OF PERSONS WHO ARE SUICIDAL, DESPAIRING OR IN DISTRESS BY PROVIDING A SERVICE PRIMARILY INTENDED FOR THE BENEFIT OF PERSONS IN YORK AND DISTRICT AND THE SURROUNDING AREA (BUT WITHOUT SPECIFIC LIMITATIONS AS TO AREA) TO ENABLE SUCH PERSONS TO RECEIVE IMMEDIATE HELP, COMPASSION AND BEFRIENDING FROM MEMBERS OF THE CHARITY SELECTED AND PREPARED FOR THE PURPOSE WORKING UNDER DIRECTION; AND ALSO WHERE APPROPRIATE, IN ACCORDANCE WITH SAMARITAN PROCEDURE, REFERRAL TO PERSONS HAVING SPECIALIST OR PROFESSIONAL SKILLS; AND TO SUPPORT THE COMPANY AND AIR IN THE ESTABLISHMENT AND SUPPORT OF PROBATIONARY BRANCHES AND THE SUPPORT OF RECOGNISED BRANCHES OF THE SMARITANS.
Maes buddion
YORK AND THE SURROUNDING AREA
Hanes cofrestru
- 31 Gorffenaf 1967: Cofrestrwyd
Enwau eraill
Dim enwau eraill
Mae'r elusen hon yn elusen gysylltiedig â
Save and Close
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.