Y Gofrestr Elusennau - Y Comisiwn Elusennau SAMARITANS OF LUTON, SOUTH BEDS AND HARPENDEN
Rhif yr elusen: 1170449-1
Elusen gysylltiedig
Dogfen lywodraethu
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15 JUN 1967
AS AMENDED ON 26 MAY 1983
AS AMENDED ON 20 MAY 1992
AS AMENDED ON 14 MAR 2006
AS AMENDED ON 03 DEC 2011
AS AMENDED ON 06 FEB 2016
AS AMENDED ON 01 APR 2017
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE:
2.1 TO WORK FOR THE ASSISTANCE OF PERSONS WHO ARE SUICIDAL, DESPAIRING OR IN DISTRESS BY PROVIDING A SERVICE PRIMARILY INTENDED FOR THE BENEFIT OF PERSONS IN LUTON, AND THE SURROUNDING AREA (BUT WITHOUT SPECIFIC LIMITATIONS AS TO AREA) TO ENABLE SUCH PERSONS TO RECEIVE IMMEDIATE HELP, COMPASSION AND BEFRIENDING FROM MEMBERS OF THE CHARITY SELECTED AND PREPARED FOR THE PURPOSE WORKING UNDER DIRECTION; AND ALSO WHERE APPROPRIATE, IN ACCORDANCE WITH SAMARITAN PROCEDURE, REFERRAL TO PERSONS HAVING SPECIALIST OR PROFESSIONAL SKILLS, AND
2.2 TO SUPPORT THE COMPANY AND AID IN THE ESTABLISHMENT AND SUPPORT OF PROBATIONARY BRANCHES AND THE SUPPORT OF RECOGNISED BRANCHES OF SAMARITANS.
Maes buddion
LUTON AND THE SURROUNDING AREA
Hanes cofrestru
- 11 Ionawr 1968: Cofrestrwyd
Enwau eraill
- LUTON SAMARITANS (Enw blaenorol)
- SAMARITANS OF LUTON SOUTH BEDS AND HARPENDEN (Enw blaenorol)
Mae'r elusen hon yn elusen gysylltiedig â
Save and Close
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.