Dogfen lywodraethu ACTION ON SMOKING AND HEALTH (ASH)
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 6TH JANUARY 1971, AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 14TH JUNE 1979 AND 10 JANUARY 1994. AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 17 FEBRUARY 2010. as amended on 25 Oct 2022
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE CHARITY IS ESTABLISHED ARE FOR SUCH PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AS ARE CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES BOTH IN ENGLAND AND OVERSEAS AND IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE AFOREGOING WORDING): 3.1 TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE HEALTH OF THE PUBLIC AGAINST THE HARMFUL EFFECTS OF CIGARETTE OR OTHER TOBACCO PRODUCTS; AND 3.2 TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC ABOUT THE EFFECTS OF CIGARETTE AND OTHER TOBACCO AND NICOTINE PRODUCTS.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.