Dogfen lywodraethu LISTENING BOOKS
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 26/05/1972 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 22/01/1974 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 09/03/1988 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14/06/1988 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 24/04/1989 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 28/06/1996 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01/07/1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13/10/1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 30/01/2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12/05/2014
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO RELIEVE DISABILITY OR INCAPACITY, WHETHER PERMANENT OR TEMPORARY, ARISING FROM ANY SICKNESS, INJURY OR OTHER PHYSICAL OR MENTAL CONDITION, IN PARTICULAR, BY THE PROVISION OF AN AUDIO BOOK LIBRARY SERVICE INCLUDING RECORDED LITERATURE AND OTHER MATERIAL, TOGETHER WITH EQUIPMENT FOR THE REPRODUCTION OF SUCH LITERATURE OR OTHER MATERIAL, INCLUDING THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM SUCH CONDITIONS.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.