Dogfen lywodraethu THE TAILWAGGERS CLUB TRUST
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 22 NOVEMBER 1972, ORDER OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS DATED 22 JULY 2004. AMENDMENT MADE BY RESOLUTIONS DATED 12 OCTOBER 2004 AND 9 JULY 2007.
Gwrthrychau elusennol
PREVENTING CRUELTY TO DOMESTIC ANIMALS AND GENERALLY PROTECTING THEM AGAINST MISUSE AND ABUSE OF EVERY KIND INCLUDING RESEARCH (OTHER THAN BY MEANS OF VIVISECTION) INTO DISEASES AND NUTRITION OF DOMESTIC ANIMALS; EDUCATING THE PUBLIC GENERALLY IN THE PROPER CARE AND TREATMENT OF DOMESTIC ANIMALS; AND TO PROVIDE VARIOUS SERVICES IN CONNECTION WITH VETERINARY HOSPITALS, SURGEONS, AND SCIENCE, AND THE CARE OF DOMESTIC ANIMALS. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 3 OF TRUST DEED DATED 22ND NOVEMBER 1972).
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.