Dogfen lywodraethu Cambridgeshire, Peterborough and South Lincolnshire (CPSL) Mind Limited
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 22 NOV 1972 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01 OCT 1987 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 19 OCT 2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14 OCT 2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 28 NOV 2013 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 30 SEP 2016 as amended on 10 May 2019 as amended on 10 May 2019 as amended on 02 Jul 2024 as amended on 02 Jul 2024
Gwrthrychau elusennol
3. Objects 3.1 The objects of the Association are, for the public benefit: 3.1.1 to promote the preservation of good mental health in particular by enabling and empowering everyone experiencing mental health problems to live with, manage and recover from their condition. 3.1.2 to relieve the needs of people with mental health problems by working to increase the understanding of mental health and mental health problems by gathering and disseminating information and working to raise awareness, promote understanding and challenge stigma and discrimination.
Maes buddion
CAMBRIDGESHIRE
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.