Dogfen lywodraethu MSI REPRODUCTIVE CHOICES
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 16/03/1973 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 25/03/1976 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27/09/1989 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13/11/1980 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21/10/2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 09/06/2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14/09/2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 25/09/2006 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 05/03/2013 as amended on 15 Nov 2020
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROVIDE SEXUAL, REPRODUCTIVE, MATERNAL AND GENERAL HEALTH SERVICES INCLUDING ADVICE, INFORMATION, EDUCATION, TRAINING, COUNSELLING, ADVOCACY, SCREENING, CLINICAL AND MEDICAL SERVICES AND TREATMENT TO REDUCE MATERNAL MORTALITY, RELIEVE SICKNESS AND PRESERVE PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND SEXUAL HEALTH AND PREVENT POVERTY AND DISTRESS RESULTING FROM UNPLANNED CONCEPTION TO CARRY OUT AND/OR PROMOTE THE CARRYING OUT OF RESEARCH RELATING TO SEXUAL AND REPRODUCTIVE HEALTH, MATERNAL AND GENERAL HEALTH
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.