Dogfen lywodraethu FINDON VALLEY RESIDENTS' ASSOCIATION
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01/01/1974 AS AMENDED ON 11/10/1988 AS AMENDED ON 17/10/1989 AS AMENDED ON 09/04/1991 AS AMENDED ON 17/05/2006 AS AMENDED ON 09 MAR 2024
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(THE SOCIETY IS ESTABLISHED FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT FOR THE FOLLOWING PURPOSES IN THE AREA COMPRISING FINDON VALLEY IN THE BOROUGH OF WORTHING, WHICH AREA SHALL HEREINAFTER BE REFERRED TO AS ‘THE AREA OF BENEFIT’. A) TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE GEOGRAPHY, HISTORY, NATURAL HISTORY AND ARCHITECTURE OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT. B) TO PROMOTE HIGH STANDARDS OF PLANNING AND THE PRESERVATION OF NOTABLE ARCHITECTURE IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT. C) TO SECURE THE PRESERVATION, PROTECTION, DEVELOPMENT AND IMPROVEMENT OF AREAS OF NATURAL BEAUTY OR ENVIRONMENTAL INTEREST IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Maes buddion
FINDON VALLEY
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.