Dogfen lywodraethu ACTION FOR PRISONERS' FAMILIES
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 29/04/1974 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27/03/1990 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05/07/1995 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17/10/2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 03/10/2011
Gwrthrychau elusennol
RELIEF OF POVERTY, AND OF HARDSHIP, SUFFERING AND DISTRESS, AMONG FAMILIES AND DEPENDENTS OF PERSONS WHO ARE ACCUSED OF OR HAVE BEEN CONVICTED OF A CRIMINAL OFFENCE OR ARE SUFFERING OR HAVE SUFFERED A LEGAL RESTRICTION ON THEIR LIBERTY IN ANY PENAL OR CORRECTIONAL ESTABLISHMENT OR THROUGH ANY MEANS WHATSOEVER.
Maes buddion
LONDON AND ELSEWHERE
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.