Dogfen lywodraethu GURU NANAK DARBAR CRAWLEY
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24/03/1974 AS AMENDED ON 22/03/1997 AS AMENDED ON 30/08/2008 AS AMENDED ON 06/11/2008 AS AMENDED ON 07/07/2012 AS AMENDED ON 19/09/2015 as amended on 15 Aug 2018 as amended on 08 Mar 2022
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(A) HOLD CONGREGATIONS TO CELEBRATE THE SIKH GURPURBS AND PREACH AND PERFORM SIKH RELIGIOUS RITES AND CEREMONIES. (B) HELP THE NEEDY AND DESTITUTE PERSONS, WIDOWS AND ORPHANS. (C) RELIEVE SICK AND NEEDY PERSONS. (D) ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF IMMIGRANTS AND MEMBERS OF THE HOST COMMUNITY CONCERNING GOOD CITIZENSHIP IN A MULTIRACIAL SOCIETY AND CO-OPERTAE WITH OTHER ORGANISATIONS ESTABLISHED FOR THE ATTAINMENT OF THEIS OBJECTIVE.
Maes buddion
CRAWLEY
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.