Dogfen lywodraethu HANWORTH COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 7TH OCTOBER 1974 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTIONS PASSED AT MEETINGS HELD ON 6 APRIL 1998 AND 20 JULY 1998 AND 23 JUNE 2008 as amended on 30 Aug 2022
Gwrthrychau elusennol
A) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE NEIGHBOURHOOD OF HANWORTH WARD (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE AREA OF BENEFIT) WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS B) TO ESTABLISH OR TO SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE CENTRE"). C) PROMOTE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED.
Maes buddion
THE NEIGHBOURHOOD OF HANWORTH WARD, BRACKNELL
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.