Dogfen lywodraethu ENGLISH SPEAKING BOARD (INTERNATIONAL) LIMITED
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 22 JUL 1976 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05 APR 1986 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05 APR 1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14 MAR 2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17 MAR 2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 24 JUN 2017 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 18 JUL 2020 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20 JUL 2024
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE ADVANCEMENT OF ENGLISH LANGUAGE AND LITERATURE WITH EMPHASIS ON ENGLISH AS A SPOKEN LANGUAGE IN SCHOOLS, COLLEGES, BUSINESS ENTERPRISES AND ANY OTHER SITUATION WHERE ENGLISH IS THE MEANS OF COMMUNICATION IRRESPECTIVE OF THE MEDIUM USED, THE IMMEDIATE ENVIRONMENT AND THE BACKGROUND OF THE INDIVIDUALS INVOLVED.
Maes buddion
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.