Dogfen lywodraethu SHRI GURU RAVI DASS SABHA
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18TH FEBRUARY 1977 AS AMENDED 13TH MAY 1979, 16TH MARCH 1985, 7 JUNE 1998 AND 30 SEPTEMBER 2007.
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(A) THE PROVISION OF WORSHIP TO ALMIGHTY GOD IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TEACHINGS OF SHRI GURU RAVI DASS JI FROM HIS HOLY BOOK SHRI GURU GRANTH SAHIB AND RESEARCH OF HOLY SCRIPTURES OF SHRI GURU RAVIDASS JI (B) THE PROVISION OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE FOR THE INHABITANTS OF GREATER LONDON WITH A PREFERENCE FOR THE LONDON BOROUGH OF EALING IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS (C) THE PROVISION OF PUBLIC EDUCATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE SAID INHABITANTS (D) RELIEF OF NEED AND SICKNESS OF THE SAID INHABITANTS (E) PROVISION OF MARRIAGE REGISTRATION FACILITIES FOR THE SAID COMMUNITY
Maes buddion
GREATER LONDON AREA
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.