Dogfen lywodraethu VINTERS PARK RESIDENTS ASSOCIATION
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 28 APRIL 1977 AS AMENDED 22 APRIL 1986, 12 APRIL 1988, 16 MAY 1991, 30 APRIL 2001, 24 APRIL 2002, 19 MARCH 2003, 30 APRIL 2003, 13 APRIL 2005, 30 APRIL 2008 AND 28 APRIL 2010
Gwrthrychau elusennol
A) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING WITH THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISTATIONS AND INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS. (B) TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE.
Maes buddion
VINTERS PARKS AND WOODLANDS ESTATES AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.