Dogfen lywodraethu The NatWest Group Pensioners Benevolent Fund
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 14TH MAY 1979 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 23 MAY 2007. AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 27 MAR 2020 AS AMENDED ON 21 APR 2020 AS AMENDED ON 21 APR 2020 AS AMENDED ON 05 AUG 2020 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 17 JUN 2024
Gwrthrychau elusennol
FOR THE RELIEF OF AND PROVIDING FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE OF ANY KIND FOR BENEFICIARIES BEING PERSONS IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES AND IN MAKING GRANTS TO OTHER CHARITABLE BODIES AND IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING) ANY OTHER CHARITABLE BODY THAT EXISTS TO SUPPORT BENEFICIARIES.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.