Dogfen lywodraethu DISABILITY LAW SERVICE
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
INCORPORATED 11/01/1979 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 10/01/1980 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11/10/1980 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 18/03/2002 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 26/01/2011 as amended on 21 Apr 2020
Gwrthrychau elusennol
For the public benefit and for general charitable purposes according to the laws of England and Wales and in particular, but not exclusively, for the promotion of equality, diversity, independence, and health of disabled people including, but not exclusively, by way of: the provision of free legal and other advice to disabled people; the provision of free legal representation for disabled people; the provision of free legal and other advice to those in poverty where to do so is part of a wider project that benefits disabled people; advocating for changes in law or policy or the way in which they are implemented where to do so will advance the interests of disabled people; the education of others about disabled people.
Maes buddion
UNDEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.