Dogfen lywodraethu BERKSHIRE FAMILY HISTORY SOCIETY
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26 JUNE 1981 AS AMENDED 18 JUNE 2007 AND 17 JUNE 2009 AS AMENDED ON 30 JUN 2017 as amended on 25 Jun 2019 as amended on 25 May 2019 as amended on 04 Sep 2020 as amended on 18 Jun 2021 as amended on 07 Jun 2023
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(1) TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION IN RESEARCH INTO FAMILY HISTORY AND GENEALOGY, PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY WITHIN THE BOUNDARIES OF THE PRE 1974 ROYAL COUNTY OF BERKSHIRE, AND, (2) TO WORK TO PROMOTE THE PRESERVATION, TRANSCRIPTION, INDEXING AND READY PUBLIC ACCESSIBILITY OF RELATED RECORDS AND INFORMATION,
Maes buddion
SEE OBJECTS
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.