Dogfen lywodraethu CLIFTON CHILDREN'S SOCIETY
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 2 AUGUST 1982 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 8 APRIL 1997, 14 OCT 1997, 24 AUGUST 2000, 28 SEPT 2006, 5 JUNE 2008, AND CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION UPON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 26 AUGUST 2008
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND THE WELFARE OF CHILDREN IN NEED FROM ALL BACKGROUNDS, CULTURES AND ALL FAITHS OR NONE, BY: 3.1.1. FURTHERING THEIR APPROPRIATE CARE AND SAFETY 3.1.2. PROVIDING ASSISTANCE AND SUPPORT TO THEM, THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS 3.1.3 ADVANCING THEIR PHYSICAL, MENTAL, SOCIAL, EMOTIONAL AND SPIRITUAL DEVELOPMENT, RESPECTING THEIR RACIAL, CULTURAL AND SPIRITUAL HERITAGE, SO THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY
Maes buddion
UNDEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.