Dogfen lywodraethu WHITECHAPEL ART GALLERY FOUNDATION
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
TRUST DEED DATED 16 MARCH 1984 AS AMENDED BY DEEDS OF AMENDMENT DATED 12 AUGUST 1988, 30 SEPTEMBER 1988, 17 SEPTEMBER 1996, AND SCHEME OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS DATED 9 MARCH 2001.
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE ARTS THROUGH ENCOURAGING AND FURTHERING THE OBJECTS OF WHITECHAPEL ART GALLERY AS SET OUT IN THE SCHEDULE TO THE DECLARATION OF TRUST PROVIDED THAT IF THE GALLERY IS WOUND UP BECOMES DEFUNCT OR CEASES TO BE REGISTERED AS A CHARITY UNDER THE CHARITIES ACT 1960 THE TRUSTEES SHALL PAY OR APPLY IT IN PROMOTING ENCOURAGING AND ADVANCING THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE ARTS.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.