Dogfen lywodraethu ACADEMY OF ST MARTIN IN THE FIELDS
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 12 APRIL 1984, AMENDED 4 MAY 2000 AND 29 MAY 2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 3 SEPTEMBER 2009. as amended on 06 Aug 2020 as amended on 07 Nov 2020
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1. THE PROMOTION, MAINTENANCE, IMPROVEMENT AND ADVANCEMENT OF MUSICAL EDUCATION FOR THE DIFFUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF INFORMATION ABOUT MUSIC AND THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLICãS TASTE FOR MUSIC 2. THE PROMOTION OR SUPPORT OF THE STUDY, PRACTICE AND PERFORMANCE OF CHAMBER ORCHESTRAL AND CHORAL MUSIC IN ALL THEIR ASPECTS BY THE GIVING OF PUBLIC CONCERTS 3. WITH A VIEW TO PROVIDING THE PUBLIC WITH BETTER MUSICIANS AND CONDUCTORS, THE PROVISION OF GRANTS TOWARDS THE EDUCATION OF AND THE PROVISION OF SPECIAL PRIZES SCHOLARSHIPS OF AWARDS TO ANY ONE OR MORE PERSON(S) WHO MAY BE MUSICIANS OR STUDENTS OF MUSIC, PROFESSIONAL OR AMATEUR, AND WHOSE WORK OR STUDY SHALL BE DEVOTED WHOLLY OR PARTLY TO PLAYING OF ANY ORCHESTRAL INSTRUMENT OR THE CONDUCTING OF ANY ORCHESTRA OR CHOIR AS THE COUNCIL MAY IN ITS DISCRETION THINK FIT 4. TO RELIEVE POVERTY AND FINANCIAL DISTRESS AMONGST MUSICIANS, CONDUCTORS, SINGERS OR OTHERS WHO HAVE BEEN ENGAGED IN THE PERFORMANCE, MANAGEMENT OR COMPOSITION OF MUSIC IN ALL ITS BRANCHES.
Maes buddion
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.