Dogfen lywodraethu THE EGYPTIAN COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION IN THE UNITED KINGDOM
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
SCHEME DATED 08/05/1998 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 09/10/1999 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 29/06/2002 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 29/05/2004 AS AMENDED ON 16 JUL 2016
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(1) TO PROMOTE AND FURTHER THE EDUCATION OF: (I) EGYPTIAN PERSONS RESIDENT IN OR VISITING THE UNITED KINGDOM; AND (II) BRITISH AND OTHER PERSONS OF WHATEVER NATIONALITY. (2) TO RELIEVE PERSONS OF EGYPTIAN ORIGIN OR MEMBERS OF THEIR FAMILY IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES WHO ARE RESIDENT OR VISITING THE UNITED KINGDOM AND IN PARTICULAR (WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING) TO ASSIST SUCH PERSONS' MEDICAL NEEDS BY ARRANGING AND MEETING OR CONTRIBUTING TOWARDS THE COST OF MEDICAL TREATMENT.
Maes buddion
UNITED KINGDOM
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.