Dogfen lywodraethu Your Ambition
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 10TH MAY 1985 AS AMENDED ON 03 JAN 2019 AS AMENDED ON 21 DEC 2018 AS AMENDED ON 03 NOV 2020 AS AMENDED ON 13 NOV 2020 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 22 FEB 2021
Gwrthrychau elusennol
The Charity’s objects are restricted specifically, and only for the public benefit, to promote and provide for the advancement of education, training, employment, rehabilitation, personal development and physical and mental well-being of adults and young people, directly or through third parties, including through social and community integration and activities.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.