Dogfen lywodraethu WEST NORFOLK MUSIC CENTRE
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24TH SEPTEMBER 1980 AS AMENDED 26TH JANUARY 1985 AND 4TH OCTOBER 1988 as amended on 10 Jun 1997 as amended on 17 Jun 2019 as amended on 31 Jul 2019 as amended on 25 Nov 2019
Gwrthrychau elusennol
For the public benefit to advance the education of people of all ages, in West Norfolk and surrounding areas, in the art and science of music in such ways as the trustees think fit, including: a. Providing musical tuition and education on an individual or group basis b. Promoting the presentation of concerts c. Providing opportunities for individuals and groups to participate in musical activities
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.